Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Paratransit Services for Dialysis Patients
Sponsored by
Delegate Hubbard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to conduct a specified study of paratransit services provided for dialysis patients in the State; requiring the study to make specified determinations and evaluate scheduling of specified dialysis treatments; and requiring the Department to report the findings and any recommendations based on the study to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2013.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0386
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM