Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Otto and McDermott
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Somerset County to the list of jurisdictions in which a Class 7 micro-brewery license may be issued; and adding Somerset County to the list of jurisdictions in which the holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license may sell at retail beer brewed under the license to customers for consumption off the licensed premises in specified refillable containers.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974334/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {974334/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM