Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Haynes, Walker, Branch, Mosby, Tarlau, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Howard, Turner, Ebersole, Patterson, D. Barnes, Simonaire, Wilkins, and Ali
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition for fiscal years 2017 through 2022 to determine the number of students used to calculate a specified grant for schools that participate in a specified federal program.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {635469/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-10)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {635469/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (127-10) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Text - Chapter - Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
(   5-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page