Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attorney General and Comptroller - Special Elections to Fill a Vacancy
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Hixson, Gutierrez, Kelly, Luedtke, Platt, Smith, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require an individual appointed by the Governor to fill a vacancy in the offices of either the Attorney General or the Comptroller to serve until a successor is elected to fill the remainder of the term, except in specified circumstances; requiring an individual appointed by the Governor to fill a vacancy in the offices of either the Attorney General or the Comptroller to serve for the remainder of the term if the vacancy occurs after a specified date; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0555
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM