Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Power of Secretary of Health - Boards and Commissions
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Health to vacate or modify to reduce the severity of any decision or determination made by a health occupations board or commission regarding disciplinary action taken against an individual licensed or certified by the board or commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Power of Secretary of Health - Boards and Commissions
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205, 8-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM