Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians - Participation in a Consumer Operated and Oriented Plan (CO-OP) Network
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Bromwell, Donoghue, Morhaim, Murphy, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Office of Student Financial Assistance to assist in the repayment of an education loan owed by a physician who practices primary care and participates in the provider network of a Consumer Operated and Oriented Plan (CO-OP) that sells health benefit plans through the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; establishing the priority of funding, through the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians, for the repayment of education loans for specified physicians; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-2801, 18-2802 through 18-2804, 18-2805, 18-2806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM