Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Rosenberg, Smigiel, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using captured plate data unless the agency has a legitimate law enforcement purpose; establishing that information gathered by an automatic license plate reader system is not subject to disclosure under the Maryland Public Information Act; requiring the Department of State Police, in conjunction with the Maryland Coordination and Analysis Center and specified law enforcement agencies, to report annually specified information to the General Assembly on or before March 1; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {292216/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {292216/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-304, 4-326 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM