Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum amount of noneconomic damages that may be recovered in certain wrongful death actions or survival actions arising on or after October 1, 2018; and providing that a jury may be informed of certain limitations on noneconomic damages in certain civil actions.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1459 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM