Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsored by
Caroline County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the budget approval process for Chesapeake College to require that capital items or programs that would require specified debt service payments be approved by a simple majority plus one of the member counties that support the college; providing that capital items or programs that are not approved by a simple majority plus one are deleted from the proposed budget and the remainder of the budget is subject to a simple majority approval requirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0147
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM