Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Barve, Brooks, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Frick, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Jalisi, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Platt, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Replacing the Construction Apprenticeship Assistance program in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation with the Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) program; providing the purpose of the program is to develop a well-trained construction workforce in the State, to encourage employers to hire specified apprentices, and to help employers offset costs associated with hiring apprentices through a grant program; stating the intent of the General Assembly to fund the program beginning in Fiscal Year 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343691/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/11 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-31)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {477872/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-20)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {343691/1 Report Adopted 21
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Motion Special Order until 2/11 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 21
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 25
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Finance 25
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {477872/1 Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 57
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (115-20) 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM