Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Barkley, Bobo, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gutierrez, Hubbard, Hucker, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0337 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM