Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Shopping Center License PG 303-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-SC (shopping center) alcoholic beverages license in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue the license for use in a restaurant in a shopping center that has a minimum area of 50,000 square feet and 10 retail units; providing that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; requiring an applicant for the license to meet certain requirements; authorizing an annual license fee of $3,025; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Shopping Center License PG 303-20
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 4:10 PM