Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Arora, Barkley, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Feldman, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Hubbard, Hucker, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Luedtke, Mitchell, Murphy, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Summers, Tarrant, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the authorization for a person to wear, carry, or transport a handgun to be within specified limitations; designating specified firearms as assault weapons; prohibiting, with specified exceptions, a person from transporting an assault weapon into the State or possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving an assault weapon; authorizing specified licensed firearms dealers to continue to possess, sell, offer for sale, or transfer specified assault weapons under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/23/2013 Text - First - Firearm Safety Act of 2013
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203, 4-301 through 4-306 )
(   5-101, 5-117.1, 5-118, 5-119, 5-120, 5-133, 5-133.1, 5-133.2, 5-133.3, 5-143, 5-205, 5-206, 5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM