Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Sponsored by
Delegate Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $5,000 to $25,000, the maximum estimated cost in labor and materials for the alteration of a certain existing building or structure for which a person is not required to employ a licensed architect under certain circumstances; and altering the circumstances under which a person is not required to employ a licensed architect.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0093
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/14/2021 1:44 PM