Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Amusement Ride Safety Advisory Board, the Occupational Safety and Health Advisory Board, the Apprenticeship and Training Council, and the Board of Boiler Rules in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2024 the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the boards and council; repealing the termination provision for the Division of Labor and Industry; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0305
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-315, 3-601, 9-101, 9-201, 9-202, 9-301 )
(   11-402, 2-107, 2-109, 3-1008, 3-103, 3-306.1, 3-608, 3-704, 3-706, 3-712, 3-801, 3-802, 3-914, 3-920, 5-306, 5-607 )
(   12-904, 12-919 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM