Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - Toll Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer and Metzgar
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from charging a toll at a toll plaza adjacent to a bridge that is a transportation facilities project for a vehicle that does not traverse the bridge.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM