Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in a Food Service Business
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, C. Watson, Charkoudian, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Kerr, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2021, a food service business from providing a single-use plastic straw to a customer dining in the food service business unless the customer requests a straw; and applying the Act.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0134 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Single-Use Plastic Straws - Use in a Food Service Business
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2101,   9-2108, 9-2109 )
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 10:25 AM