Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Rosenberg, Hixson, Kaiser, Barkley, Busch, Guzzone, Hammen, Howard, Hucker, Lafferty, Luedtke, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Swain, Tarrant, V. Turner, A. Washington, and Carr
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding prekindergarten services to specified 4-year-old children; establishing the Prekindergarten Expansion Grant Program; providing expansion grants may be used for establishing or expanding existing half-day and full-day prekindergarten programs for specified eligible children, and establishing or expanding existing Judy Centers for families of specified children; requiring a qualified vendor who has received a grant in the current year to be awarded a grant in the following year under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {265960/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carr) {923227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-33)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {265960/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carr) {923227/1 Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (103-33) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-217, 7-101.1, 7-101.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM