Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Dorchester County to approve more than one beer and wine festival in Dorchester County each year to be held on a weekend; prohibiting the Board from approving more than one festival for any one weekend; and requiring the Board to approve a location for a festival that is not already licensed.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0051
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-102, 19-1304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM