Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number and term of winery special event permits the Comptroller may issue to Class 4 Maryland limited wineries for use at specified farmers' markets in Carroll County; and authorizing the Comptroller to issue a winery special event permit for unlimited use for 1 day each week.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM