Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Costa, Cullison, Frick, Gaines, Glenn, Hammen, Hucker, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Luedtke, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, and F. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Health Services Cost Review Commission, consistent with Maryland's all-payer model contract, to establish hospital rate levels and rate increases in a specified manner and promote and approve specified alternative methods of rate determination and payment; increasing the total amount of specified user fees that the Commission may assess; requiring the Commission to make a report, beginning October 1, 2014, and every 6 months thereafter, to specified individuals and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0335
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856688/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {513620/1 Rejected (37-77)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {173425/1 Rejected (39-76)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) {943726/1 Rejected (39-82)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Stocksdale) {173126/1 Rejected (36-88)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {856688/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {513620/1 Rejected (37-77) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {173425/1 Rejected (39-76) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) {943726/1 Rejected (39-82) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Stocksdale) {173126/1 Rejected (36-88) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-207, 19-212, 19-213, 19-214, 19-217, 19-219, 19-710 )
(   15-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM