Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a provision of law that prohibits the Charles County Board of License Commissioners from issuing specified licenses to sell alcoholic beverages in any building located within specified distances of specified schools applies to licenses with on-sale and off-sale privileges; providing the size of a sign be not less than 24 by 36 inches which the Charles County Board of License Commissioners is required to supply to specified applicants for alcoholic beverages licenses; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713392/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2014 1/21/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments {713392/1 Report Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-202, 9-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM