Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Carter, Oaks, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the medical use of marijuana under specified circumstances; repealing criminal provisions that allow the imposition of a fine or the use of an affirmative defense for use or possession of marijuana or use or possession of drug paraphernalia related to marijuana under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations on or before September 1, 2013; authorizing the Department to vary application and renewal fees along a sliding scale; requiring a specified annual report; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0015 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. ( Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. ( Health and Government Operations)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-619 )
(   25-101 through 25-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM