Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of On-Site Wastewater Professionals in the Department of the Environment to regulate individuals who perform on-site wastewater services in the State and to establish minimum standards for certain on-site wastewater systems; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Board, to set by regulation certain fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses and other Board-provided services; requiring the Board to establish a certain code of ethics; establishing the On-Site Wastewater Professionals Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0136 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 1:07 PM