Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a carrier from increasing a premium rate charged under a policy or contract of long-term care insurance issued to an insured or entered into by a contract holder who is 85 years of age or older.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2020
Legislative Date
10/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2020 10/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:57 PM