Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Carr, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Henson, Hettleman, Hill, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 160
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General to bring a certain action under the Consumer Protection Act against a person who violates a certain provision of criminal law regarding the exploitation of a vulnerable adult; adding a violation of a certain provision of criminal law regarding the exploitation of a vulnerable adult to the unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practices that are subject to enforcement and penalties under the Act; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 160
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Finance 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 160
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-201, 13-204, 13-301 )
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:44 PM