Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Angel, Barkley, D. Barnes, Barron, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Jackson, Jalisi, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Luedtke, McMillan, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Robinson, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Valderrama, A. Washington, M. Washington, P. Young, Kaiser, Turner, Hixson, Afzali, Buckel, Hornberger, C. Howard, Long, Reilly, Rose, Simonaire, Walker, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to identify homeowners who may be eligible but have failed to apply for the homestead property tax credit; and requiring the Department to include a separate insert with each assessment notice sent to each homeowner that may be eligible for the property tax credit that informs the homeowner about the potential for eligibility and how to apply for the credit.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545468/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {545468/1 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 33
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text - Chapter - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM