Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Haddaway-Riccio, and Lafferty
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the commercial rearing of shellfish seed outside specified leased areas without first obtaining a shellfish nursery permit from the Department of Natural Resources; placing limitations on the issuance and scope of a permit for land-based and in-water shellfish nursery operations; exempting shellfish nursery products from specified water quality classifications and restrictions; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {160510/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {160510/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 35
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11A-23 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM