Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student Enrollment
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the required maintenance of effort appropriation that the county governing body of Carroll County must make to the school operating budget when there is a decrease in student enrollment under specified circumstances; providing for the effective date of specified provisions of the Act; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page