Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board in the Department of Information Technology; providing for the membership, appointment, terms, staggering of terms, chair, meetings, and staffing of the Board; establishing that members of the Board may not receive a specified compensation but are entitled to a specified reimbursement; establishing specified duties and responsibilities of the Board; specifying the terms of the initial members of the Board; specifying the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/14/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 33
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Finance 32
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-501 through 1-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM