Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Office of Information Systems - Video and Audio Recordings
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer and Metzgar
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Information Systems in the Department of Legislative Services to make video recordings of meetings of standing committees and audio recordings of floor sessions of the Senate and the House of Delegates; requiring the Office to make each recording available to the public on the General Assembly Web site without charge and, to the extent practicable, within 12 hours after the recording is made; and requiring that a recording be in a specified format.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM