Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Charkoudian, Hill, Lisanti, and Shetty
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain construction to conduct a rapid health impact assessment (HIA) on the project and report on its findings; requiring a rapid HIA report to be completed not later than 45 days after the applicant submits the applicant's application to the Public Service Commission; requiring an applicant to complete the rapid HIA in a certain manner; requiring the rapid HIA report to be considered part of a certain application; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903996/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-32)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {903996/1 Adopted 50
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (102-32) 51
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM