Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival license in Montgomery County; authorizing a specified festival organization to conduct a beer, wine, and liquor festival under the supervision of the Montgomery County Department of Liquor Control; specifying conditions under which beer, wine, or liquor may be displayed and sold on or off the festival premises at specified times; requiring a festival organization to choose festival weekends and location; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-102, 25-1304, 25-1305, 25-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM