Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Kelly, Metzgar, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland to study access to dental services for all State residents, identify areas lacking in dental services for a significant number of people, identify barriers to receiving services, analyze the impact of barriers, assess options to eliminate barriers, and make recommendations on methods to increase access to dental services; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by May 1, 2020, and a final report by December 1, 2020, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM