Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Carroll County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino night under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Board of License Commissioners of Carroll County before conducting a card game, card tournament, or casino night; requiring an organization that seeks a permit to meet specified requirements; specifying that a card game, card tournament, or casino night may be managed and organized by specified organizations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0133 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/24/2013 Text - First - Carroll County - Gaming
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-906, 13-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM