Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Partially Elected School Board
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Carter, Conaway, Haynes, Oaks, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of members of the Baltimore City School Commissioners; requiring that three board members be elected at large by the voters of Baltimore City; altering the length of a term of the members of the board; requiring specified board members to be elected at a specified election and in accordance with specified provisions of law; providing for the staggering of the terms of specified members; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0710
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0014 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108.1, 3-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM