Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Cluster, Dumais, Ebersole, Glass, Hill, Kelly, Lam, Malone, McComas, Morales, Parrott, Pendergrass, Proctor, Smith, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding misuse of telephone facilities and equipment, misuse of electronic communication or interactive computer service, revenge porn, and visual surveillance to the list of offenses alleged to have been committed by a respondent against a victim for which a peace order request or a peace order petition may be filed under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0346
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/31/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM