Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain provision of law authorizing a mortgagor or grantor to refinance the indebtedness secured by a first mortgage or deed of trust without obtaining permission from the holder of a certain junior lien does not apply to a junior lien securing a loan made by a state or local government agency with a 0% interest rate; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 10:20 AM