Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Leases - Rent Stabilization and Just Cause Evictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Cullison, Gutierrez, Hucker, Kaiser, Luedtke, and A. Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from using a lease containing a provision that requires a tenant to carry renter's insurance naming the landlord as beneficiary; restricting rental fee increases on specified residential rental units to 5% of the base rent; providing that a landlord may exceed the maximum rental fee increase authorized by the Act under specified circumstances; prohibiting a landlord renting four or more residential units from evicting a tenant in the absence of just cause; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-201, 8-208, 8-209, 8-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM