Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - E-Verify Program
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Boteler, Cluster, Costa, Dwyer, Eckardt, Fisher, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Hough, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McMillan, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring that it is the public policy of the State to restrict and deter the use of unauthorized alien workers in the performance of public contracts and grants in the State; specifying criteria for mandatory registration in a federal E-Verify program for specified contractors and grantees; prohibiting noncompliant persons or entities from performing specified contracts; imposing specified requirements on subcontractors; authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to assess penalties; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0082 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/24/2013 Text - First - State Government - E-Verify Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101 through 20-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM