Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2020 Census Complete Count Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Guyton, Jackson, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Palakovich Carr, Proctor, Shetty, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the 2020 Census Complete Count Commission to ensure the fair and accurate counting of individuals in hard-to-count populations residing in the State and local jurisdictions in the 2020 Census; requiring the Commission to perform certain duties; authorizing the Commission to establish subcommittees; requiring the Commission to submit an interim report and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2019, and June 30, 2020, respectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0455
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 2020 Census Complete Count Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - 2020 Census Complete Count Commission
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM