Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law which require the Maryland Higher Education Commission to collect and provide to the Maryland Longitudinal Data System identifying information on certain business licensees and students; requiring certain licensing authorities that issue occupational or professional licenses to make every effort to comply with the data requirements and implementation schedule of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System, and to transfer student data in accordance with the data security and safeguarding plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0850 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 9:09 AM