Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Carr, Frush, Gaines, Gutierrez, Kelly, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified buyer or beneficiary of a pre-need contract to contact the Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors and request the Board to conduct an audit of specified licensees; requiring the Board to conduct a specified audit within 30 days after a specified request; requiring a specified disclosure statement for a pre-need contract to state that the buyer or beneficiary of the pre-need contract is authorized to contact the Board and request a specified audit; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0159
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-205, 7-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM