Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum terms of imprisonment for the crimes of manslaughter by vehicle or vessel, homicide by vehicle or vessel while under the influence of alcohol or under the influence of alcohol per se, homicide by vehicle or vessel while impaired by alcohol, homicide by vehicle or vessel while impaired by drugs, and homicide by vehicle or vessel while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0393 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-209, 2-503, 2-504, 2-505, 2-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM