Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 10 grams to 1 ounce, the amount of marijuana below which possession is a civil offense, rather than a criminal offense; and creating a presumption that a person in possession of less than 1 ounce of marijuana is not in violation of a certain provision of law with regard to marijuana in the absence of any other evidence of a certain violation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0143
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0550 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/16/2020
Legislative Date
6/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/16/2020 6/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/14/2021 12:29 PM