Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the clerk of the court to include the name of the judge or magistrate who presided over a hearing or took judicial action as part of case information in the case management system of the court; requiring a clerk of the District Court to include the name of the judge who presided over a hearing or took judicial action as part of case information in the case management system of the District Court; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0075 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2020
Legislative Date
9/18/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2020 9/18/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing canceled
Text - First - Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:20 PM