Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission Reform Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that not more than three commissioners of the Public Service Commission may be of the same political party; providing that not more than two commissioners may be from a single county; providing that the appointment of a commissioner is subject to specified restrictions on appearing before the Commission or receiving specified benefits for 1 year before the appointment; requiring the Commission to conduct at least two customer service meetings each year in different regions of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-102, 2-108, 2-110, 2-114, 2-306, 7-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM