Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award and Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to assist in the repayment of specified higher education loans owed by recipients of a Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award who receive specified degrees from specified institutions; altering a specified definition to authorize a specified student attending an institution of higher education outside the State to qualify for a Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship; and altering qualifications for eligibility for a specified scholarship.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0889
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1502, 18-1701, 18-1702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM