Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldman, Hucker, Barkley, Barnes, Braveboy, Carr, Frush, Howard, Hubbard, Ivey, K. Kelly, Luedtke, McHale, Mizeur, Niemann, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified individuals performing work on public work projects to complete construction safety training; requiring contractors, before beginning work on a public work contract, to provide a certification to a public body indicating that each individual working on the site has completed the construction safety training course within the past 5 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0555
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1330 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-801 through 17-808 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM