Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Barve, Bromwell, Costa, Hubbard, James, Kach, K. Kelly, Kipke, Lafferty, McMillan, W. Miller, Mizeur, O'Donnell, Pena-Melnyk, Smigiel, Stein, Tarrant, V. Turner, Hammen, Pendergrass, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, A. Kelly, Krebs, McDonough, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Ready, and Reznik
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a public body take specified actions if the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board determines that a violation of the Open Meetings Act has occurred; providing that compliance with specified provisions of the Act is not an admission to a specified violation and may not be used as evidence in a specified proceeding; repealing a prohibition on the introduction of opinions issued by the Board as evidence in specified proceedings; increasing the penalties for violations of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0826
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786285/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Bobo) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {786285/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Bobo) Adopted 38
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 40
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-502.5, 10-510, 10-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM